Chuang, Rita Jo-Yun (CPSO#: 95273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-978-6976
Fax: 416-978-7144
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chuang and Dr. Champagne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Champagne ( CPSO# 95271 )
Dr. R. Chuang ( CPSO# 95273 )

Business Address:
Front Frederick Health
Suite 1400
365 Bloor Street East
14th Floor
Toronto ON  M4W 3L4
Phone Number: (416) 362-8777

Business Address:
500 University Avenue
Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Business Address:
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 590-9918

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
R.K. Schachter Dermatology Centre
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 3E4
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
1450 O'Connor Drive
Toronto ON  M4B 1Z1
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA JO-YUN CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013