Chuen, Luan Lok-Yan (CPSO#: 86423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Christie Clinic
726 Bloor Street West, Suite B101
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone: (647) 350-5445
Fax: (647) 350-5446
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luan L. Chuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chuen ( CPSO# 86423 )

Business Address:
Unit B101
726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone Number: (647) 350-5445

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUAN LOK-YAN CHUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009