Chui, Betty Ka-Yeung (CPSO#: 85446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44562
Fax: 9055771475
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Betty Chui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chui ( CPSO# 85446 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTY KA-YEUNG CHUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013