Chui, Mathew Ming Fai (CPSO#: 100684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Shellington Place
Unit 204
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Canada
Phone: 519 759-6116
Fax: 519-759-7727
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathew M.F. Chui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chui ( CPSO# 100684)

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHEW MING FAI CHUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015