Chui, Sze Wing (CPSO#: 94747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Nov 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 0M2
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 34435
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chui ( CPSO# 94747 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
Room C3 - 106
London ON  N6G 0M2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 15 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 May 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sze Wing Chui may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia  and  Perioperative  Medicine,  University  of  Western
                        Ontario,  in  which  Dr.  Chui holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Chui  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Chui's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Chui's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of  the  practice  assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 21, 2013, and expires on  June 30,
                  2018.   Upon renewal of Dr. Chui's academic appointment at the University
                  of Western  Ontario,  the  expiry  date  can  be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.