Chun, Kooyeon (CPSO#: 64974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Humber College Blvd
Suite 205
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 741-5077
Fax: (416) 749-3640
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOOYEON CHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993