Chun, Samuel Seung Su (CPSO#: 64773)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 20 Sep 1995
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Queen's University, 21 Sep 1995 to 30 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1996 to 31 Jan 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Oct 1999