Chun, Soohun (CPSO#: 89256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street, Floor 3,Rm3437
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4834
Fax: (416) 323-6304
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Myhealth Centre
1849 Yonge Street, Suite 218
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: 4169283467
Fax: 4169283502
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Soohun Chun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chun ( CPSO# 89256 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
3rd Floor
Room 3437
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Suite 218
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 928-3467

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOOHUN CHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012