Chun, Young Choo (CPSO#: 46099)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2008