Chung, Brian James (CPSO#: 53902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vancouver General Hospital
Emergency Department
855 West 12th Avenue
Vancouver BC  V5Z 1M9
Phone: (604) 875-5262

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985