Chung, Bruce Tang Wing (CPSO#: 29696)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Durham Medical Clinic c/o Dr. Sarita Singh 368 College Street North Durham ON N0G 1R0 Tel: 519-369-2510 Fax: 519-369-3831
Date Received: 12 Jun 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015