Chung, Bryan Tak-Chee (CPSO#: 90297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan Tak-Chee Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chung ( CPSO# 90297 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 15 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN TAK-CHEE CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2009 to 27 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013