Chung, Caroline (CPSO#: 87926)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017