Chung, Chin Kwan (CPSO#: 27473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Madawaska Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2R1
Phone: (416) 222-4637
Fax: (416) 222-3178
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. K. Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chung ( CPSO# 27473 )
Dr. D. Chung ( CPSO# 79399 )
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
9 Madawaska Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2R1
Phone Number: (416) 222-4637

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIN KWAN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975