Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chung, Corinna Rei-in (CPSO#: 70605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 syndicate ave
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1E1
Phone: (807) 625-5400
Fax: (807) 625-6520
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

69 Court St. S
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4T7
Canada
Phone: (807) 344-4100
Fax: (807) 344-4115
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Dobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dobson ( CPSO# 62752 )
Dr. C. Chung ( CPSO# 70605 )

Business Address:
2 - 140 Syndicate Avenue South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1E1
Phone Number: (807) 625-5400

Business Address:
69 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4T7
Phone Number: (807) 633-6666

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Thunder Bay Regional Health Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINNA REI-IN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996