Chung, Dae-Gyun (CPSO#: 65205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Keele and Lawrence US
2355 Keele St., Unit D1
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone: 416-729-9007
Fax: (416) 245-4008
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dae-Gyun Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chung ( CPSO# 65205 )

Business Address:
D1 - 2355 Keele Street
North York ON  M6M 4A2
Phone Number: (416) 243-8487

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8

Business Address:
2141 Jane Street
Lower Level
North York ON  M3M 1A2
Phone Number: (416) 425-4111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAE-GYUN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993