Chung, David Chi Wai (CPSO#: 25768)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1998