Chung, Doreen Eleanor (CPSO#: 79399)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. K. Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )
Dr. C. Chung ( CPSO# 27473 )
Dr. D. Chung ( CPSO# 79399 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
9 Madawaska Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2R1
Phone Number: (416) 222-4637

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 31 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008