Chung, Edward Yao-Chao (CPSO#: 65458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 873-1401
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Chung and Dr. Renee Beland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beland ( CPSO# 63868 )
Dr. E. Chung ( CPSO# 65458 )

Business Address:
208 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2283

Business Address:
103 - 73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 873-1401

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD YAO-CHAO CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993