Chung, Jim Joohyun (CPSO#: 69071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Air Canada OHS
6500 Silver Dart Dr Bldg F 3rd Flr
Mississauga ON  L5P 1B4
Phone: (905) 676-2400
Fax: (905) 676-2402
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carlton and Church Medical
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1L1
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
Fax: (416) 646-1892
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chung ( CPSO# 69071 )

Business Address:
Air Canada OHS
305 - 6500 Silver Dart Drive
Mississauga ON  L5P 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 676-2400

Business Address:
Carlton and Church Medical
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1L1
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIM JOOHYUN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997