Chung, Pin (CPSO#: 70161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbine Medical Centre
Building B Unit 9
76 Arlington Drive
Keswick ON  L4P 0A9
Phone: (905) 476-0308
Fax: (905) 476-1079
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pin Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chung ( CPSO# 70161 )

Business Address:
Unit 9 - 76 Arlington Drive
Building B
Keswick ON  L4P 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 476-0308

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1998