Chung, Sun Yung (CPSO#: 60787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pickering Holistic Health Centre
Suite 220
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 831-9797 Ext. 6
Fax: (905) 839-9984
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sun Yung Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chung ( CPSO# 60787 )

Business Address:
Pickering Holistic Health Centre
Suite 220
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 831-9797

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUN YUNG CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990