Chuong, Roselynn (CPSO#: 88679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: (416) 482-8880
Fax: (416) 482-8881
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 York Street Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: 416-350-5900
Fax: 416-350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

825 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 383-1251
Fax: (416) 383-6084
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roselynn Chuong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chuong ( CPSO# 88679 )

Business Address:
825 Don Mills Road
Main Floor
Toronto ON  M3C 1V4
Phone Number: (416) 383-1251

Business Address:
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
Suite 202
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 482-8880

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSELYNN CHUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010