Church, Brian Arthur (CPSO#: 70246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Victoria Hospital Room D2 315
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58525
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6G 2V4
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Church Kilgar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 3 2014


Corporation Name: B A Church Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Church ( CPSO# 70246 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room D2 315
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 2V4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ARTHUR CHURCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHURCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998