Church, Karalyn Lee (CPSO#: 84831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Vermont, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Department Of Emergency Medicine
Room E1 102
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karalyn L. Church Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Church ( CPSO# 84831 )

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-7111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARALYN LEE CHURCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHURCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011