Church, Peter Christopher (CPSO#: 94044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
Hepatology and Nutrition
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 206171
Fax: (416) 813-4972
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER CHRISTOPHER CHURCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHURCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2013