Churchill, Bernard Murray (CPSO#: 20966)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995