Chute, Terence Wayne (CPSO#: 26945)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2006