Cicoria, Eugenio (CPSO#: 52608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 5Z8
Phone: (519) 756-0171
Fax: (519) 756-0176
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 8, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eugenio Cicoria, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cicoria to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. EUGENIO CICORIA
                                          ("Dr. Cicoria")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Cicoria, certificate of registration number 52608, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that the College received information from
                  the NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215559 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Cicoria, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective immediately upon the signing of this Undertaking.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cicoria, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A", including but not limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing.
                  
                        (ii)  Review and provide a written summary of the following
                              resources:
                  
                              (1)   CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-
                                    Drugs;
                  
                              (2)   Current 2017 Canadian Guideline for Safe and Effective
                                    Use of Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/opioid;
                  
                              (3)   article on Preventing the misuse of
                                    opioids:https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                                    and
                  
                              (4)   the Medical Record policy:
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-
                                    Records.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cicoria, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cicoria, undertake that, approximately six (6) months  after
                        the Professional Education set out under section 5 of the
                        Undertaking has been completed, I will submit to a reassessment of
                        my practice by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Reassessment").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cicoria, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking.   
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cicoria, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cicoria, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cicoria, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "B" and Schedule "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cicoria, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring
                        System about Dr. Cicoria's prescribing of controlled substances,
                        including narcotics.
                  
                        Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                        investigation into whether Dr. Cicoria failed to maintain the
                        standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in
                        his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.  As
                        a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Cicoria will engage in professional education in
                                    the prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                    narcotics.
                  
                              *     Following the professional education, Dr. Cicoria's
                                    prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                    narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected
                                    by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Cicoria, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Cicoria, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Cicoria, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eugenio Cicoria to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective June 8, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Cicoria's prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Cicoria failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Cicoria will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

- Following the professional education, Dr. Cicoria's prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.