Cil, Tulin Deniz (CPSO#: 74971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Surgical Oncology
OPG 6th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3984
Fax: 4169464429
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tulin Cil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cil ( CPSO# 74971 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
OPG 6th Floor
Department of Surgical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TULIN DENIZ CIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005