Cinats, John George (CPSO#: 57852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 11202 76 Avenue Edmonton, AB T6G 0K1
Date Received: 04 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2014