Cinco, Jude Erric Labao (CPSO#: 81985)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the Philippines, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 20 Dec 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007