Cino, Maria (CPSO#: 59899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital Site
399 Bathurst Street - 8 MP, Rm 326
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5724
Fax: (416) 603-5439
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA CINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1991