Cioata Tomsa, Elena (CPSO#: 94033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
303-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-6419
Fax: (905) 623-6417
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elena Cioata Tomsa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cioata Tomsa ( CPSO# 94033 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-6419

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA CIOATA TOMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIOATA TOMSA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012