Cipolla, Amanda Rose (CPSO#: 93907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-8885
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Cipolla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cipolla ( CPSO# 93907 )

Business Address:
Suite 502
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-8748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA ROSE CIPOLLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPOLLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015