Cirkovic, George Herman (CPSO#: 26952)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993