Cirone, Robert (CPSO#: 63582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Cirone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Dr. R. Cirone ( CPSO# 63582 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ROBERT CIRONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIRONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992