Cirone, Sharon Louise (CPSO#: 63603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: Van Wonderen, Sharon Louise (used until: 17 Sep 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6825
Fax: (416) 530-6393
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1290 Bloor Street west
Toronto ON  M6H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (416) 537-7000
Fax: (416) 537-0132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Round Lake First Nation
Sioux Lookout ON  P0V 2Y0
Canada
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON LOUISE CIRONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIRONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992