Ciszkowski, Catherine (CPSO#: 101647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
Westmount Shopping Centre
785 Wonderland R S. Ste 200
London ON  N6K1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: 5196416189
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE CISZKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CISZKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015