Citren, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 26447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 637-6608
Fax: (905) 637-3144
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2007


Corporation Name: Citren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Citren ( CPSO# 26447 )

Business Address:
Burlington Professional Centre
STL Diagnostic Imaging
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 637-6608

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL CITREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CITREN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1974