Citynski, Hollie Leigh Ann (CPSO#: 86332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto Scarborough
Health & Wellness Centre (SL-270)
1265 Military Trail
Scarborough ON  M1C 1A4
Phone: (416) 287-7065
Fax: 416-287-7069
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOLLIE LEIGH ANN CITYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CITYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2011 to 20 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2012 to 10 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016