Ciurria, Nicholas Samuel (CPSO#: 29153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Danforth Medical Centre
1473 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N5
Phone: (416) 461-0785
Fax: (416) 461-0787
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2754 Victoria Park Avenue
North York ON  M2J 4A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-3910
Fax: (416) 491-3919
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Ciurria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ciurria ( CPSO# 29153 )

Business Address:
Danforth Medical Centre
1473 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 461-0785

Business Address:
2754 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M2J 4A8
Phone Number: (416) 491-3910

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Sep 2017 Active

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nicholas Samuel Ciurria to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 6, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Ciurria’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Ciurria failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Ciurria’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of nine (9) months.

- Dr. Ciurria will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.