Clancy, Robert Llewellyn (CPSO#: 41796)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 1992