Clarizia, Nadia Angela (CPSO#: 106470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Division of Cardiac Surgery
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4313
Fax: 613-761-5107
Electoral District: 07

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Nadia  Angela  Clarizia  shall  practise medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program  in which Dr. Clarizia is enrolled
                  at the University of Ottawa.

            (2)   In Dr. Clarizia's practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Clarizia shall prescribe drugs only for  in-patients  or out-patients
                  of  a  clinical  teaching  unit  that  is  formally  affiliated with  the
                  department  where  Dr.  Clarizia is properly practising medicine  and  to
                  which postgraduate trainees  are  regularly assigned by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Clarizia's practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Clarizia shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Clarizia may practise medicine  in  the  surgical intensive care unit
                  and  to the extent of her employment at the University  of  Ottawa  Heart
                  Institute  Ottawa,  while  under  supervision coordinated by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Clarizia's practice specified  in  paragraph (4), Dr. Clarizia may
                  not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. Clarizia must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Clarizia  is  no  longer  enrolled   in   a  program  of
                        postgraduate  medical  education  provided  by a medical school  in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr. Clarizia no longer holds Canadian citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and  Dr.   Clarizia  must immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4)  notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Clarizia's practice,  including  but not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Clarizia's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Clarizia  to  engage  in  practice outside the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  Clarizia's  employment  as  specified  in paragraph  (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Clarizia takes a leave of absence, or transfers  to  another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education  program  specified in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the   event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Clarizia  may not resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education program  under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Clarizia applies  for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on November 1, 2017.  In  accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate  of  registration  expires  on  June 30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.