Clark, Benjamin Brian (CPSO#: 71199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone: (905) 333-5100 Ext. 5
Fax: (905) 333-5107
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Unit 335
5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 678-2924
Fax: (905) 678-2939
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin B. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Clark ( CPSO# 71199 )

Business Address:
174 - 5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1R9
Phone Number: (905) 678-2924

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
506 - 3027 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone Number: (905) 333-5100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BRIAN CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002