Clark, Daniel Ryan (CPSO#: 85703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Sunnybrook Hospital
C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Ryan Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Clark ( CPSO# 85703 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
Emergency Department
Room C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL RYAN CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2015