Clark, James Montague (CPSO#: 18945)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CPM Unit 6 2125 Wyecroft Road Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Date Received: 22 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 2015