Clark, Jessica Michelle (CPSO#: 79102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: Wylie, Jessica Michelle (used until: 16 Jun 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
115 Bell Farm
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone: (705) 737-3945
Fax: (705) 503-1180
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 07 Feb 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA MICHELLE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010