Clark, Jonathan Robert (CPSO#: 80425)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2004 to 24 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005