Clark, Kerr William (CPSO#: 22507)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kerr W. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Hanover Medical Group, 118 7th Avenue, Hanover ON N4N 2G9
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015